Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Schultz, Nicholas M, filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case against State Licensing, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Carol Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarol Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2022 |
CategoryAlr Administrative Law Review |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipts Record destroyed per Agency |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Assignment for Trial Setting
Judge: Murphy, Carol |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Appeal |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss and Proposed Order |
|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Index Agency Record |
|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certification 12 Page Record |
|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Certified Appeal Board Record | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.