Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Abubakar, Bibi, filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case against City Of Seattle, State Social And Health Services, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with James J. Dixon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames J. Dixon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryAlr Administrative Law Review |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
ALR Hearing
Judge: Dixon, James J |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing City's Motion Judge: Dixon, James J |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Schedule | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Assignment for Trial Setting
Judge: Dixon, James J |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response Respondent's Scheduling Questionnaire |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.