Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Muir, Mary Isabella, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Larson, Rebecca Marie, against Evergreen State College, State Of Washington, represented by Welch, Heather L, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Carol Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Disburse Funds | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's for Order to Disburse Funds |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Rebecca M. Larson |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment Stipulated |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Striking Hearing | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Assignment for Trial Setting
Judge: Murphy, Carol |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.