Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Anwar, Shazia, Brito, Manuel, Liang, Sylvia, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Robbins, Jennifer L, against State Of Washington, State Social And Health Services, Strange, Cheryl, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Indu Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2020 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion Petition | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Adam Domanski |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Counsel Darin M Dalmat |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Seond Distribution and Correction of Error |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter form Senator Mark Schoesler |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 12 Days Judge: Thomas, Indu |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference
Judge: Thomas, Indu |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.