Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Labelle, Benjamin Dean, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Westbrook, Thomas Jay, against Bank Of America Na, represented by Oates, Daniel J, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Mary Sue Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2020 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial 1 Day Judge: Wilson, Mary Sue |
|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference
Judge: Wilson, Mary Sue |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Schedule | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Assignment for Trial Setting
Judge: Wilson, Mary Sue |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response Scheduling Questionnaire |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.