Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Menke, Matthew, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cochran, Loren A, against Mccutcheon, Brett, Olympia Sheet Metal Inc, represented by Williams, Andrew Bennett, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Carol Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2020 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 4 Days Judge: Murphy, Carol |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Show Cause
Judge: Murphy, Carol |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Order of Dismissal |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings of Dismissal |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.