Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Doran, Linda, Doran, Phillip, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Dashiell, Thomas, against Safeco Insurance Company Of America, Sears Holdings Management Corporation, Sears Home Improvement Products Inc, represented by Vollans, Ryan Wayne, Windus, Thomas Kent, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Erik D. Price presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2017 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial 2 Days Judge: Price, Erik D |
|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference
Judge: Price, Erik D |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Email from Judicial Assistant to Parties |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Striking Hearing | |
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service Amended |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference
Judge: Price, Erik D |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Letter from the Court to Counsel |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Litigant Safeco Insurance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.