Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
American Airlines Inc, Amr Corporation, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case against King County, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Gary R. Tabor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary R. Tabor Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) -: NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE; 03-02-2015; 2-DAY TRIAL; |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 18: ORDER SETTING CASE SCHEDULE; 02-06-2015; PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; |
|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Receipts 23: RECEIPT(S); ***********************************; CHANGE OF VENUE FORWARD ALL FUTURE; PLEADINGS TO KING COUNTY; CAUSE # 14-2-22866-0; ***********************************; |
|
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed 22: TRANSMITTAL LETTER - COPY FILED; |
|
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Change of Venue | |
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order for Change of Venue 21: ORDER FOR CHANGE OF VENUE; |
|
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Disclosure 20: DISCLOSURE DEF FACT WITNESSES; |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Confirmation of Joinder Claim or Defense to be Raised 19: C.J.: CLAIM OR DEFENSE TO BE RAISED; |
|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.