Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Ornstil, Phillip Samuel, against Neely, Christine, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Release of Writ of Garnishment |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Garnishment | |
November 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
November 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant | |
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit in Support |
|
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Judgment & Order to Pay |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.