Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Nisqually Pines Community Club, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Wilson-Hoss, Robert Dryden, against Bac Home Loans Servicing Lp, Bank Of America, Keybank National Association, Mortgage Electronic Registrationsystems Inc, Stewart Title Company, (total of 7) See All represented by Preble, Gary Alan, Sommer, Brian S, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Gary R. Tabor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary R. Tabor Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2013 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice 22: NOTICE STRIKING TRIAL SCHEDULE DATE; |
|
April 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judge Gary R. Tabor, Trial Scheduling Conference SCHEDULING CONFERENCE |
|
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Release 21: RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS; |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 20: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss 19: MOTION TO DISMISS; |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 18: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 17: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 16: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.