Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Price, Veronica, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Travelers Indemnity Co, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Christine Schaller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristine Schaller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2013 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerks Order of Dismissal | |
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment 6: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT WILSON; |
|
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice 5: NOTICE STRIKING TRIAL SCHEDULING DT; |
|
April 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judge Christine Schaller, Trial Scheduling Conference SCHEDULING CONFERENCE |
|
December 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment 3: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT; 04-18-2014C2; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; |
|
December 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Complaint 4: COMPLAINT; |
|
December 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Information Cover Sheet 1: CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.