Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Wallace, Mark S, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2013 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Garnishment | |
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Garnishment | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 29: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
July 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 28: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
July 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 27: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 26: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 25: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.