Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Bowes, Sharon F, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Carol Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarol Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2013 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 3: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT; 04-11-2014; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; |
|
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Sealing Document 27: ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT; |
|
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 24: MOTION HEARING; JUDGE CAROL MURPHY; CC PITTMAN CR SHACKELL; |
|
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice 26: NOTICE ADDRESS CHANGE FOR DEFENDANT; |
|
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 25: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judge Carol Murphy, Civil Motion Calendar MOTION TO SEAL |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion 22: MOTION TO VACATE WRIT; |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion 23: MOTION TO SEAL CASE RECORDS; |
|
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 21: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.