Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Drowley, Richard Douglas, against Morgan, Katheleen H W, Morgan, Wesley L, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Erik D. Price presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErik D. Price Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2013 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 23: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; |
|
September 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Trust Received - Garnishment 22: TRUST RCVD-GARNISHMENT; |
|
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant 21: JDGMT ON ANSWER OF GARN DEF; |
|
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 20: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 19: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of NonMilitary Service 18: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; |
|
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 17: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 16: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judge Erik D. Price, Trial Scheduling Conference SCHEDULING CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.