Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Serrano, Norberto, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case against Cindy, Hecht, Jeffrey, State Doc, Warner, Bernie, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Anne Hirsch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnne Hirsch Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2013 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Uncontested Resolution Hearing | |
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Clerks Order of Dismissal | |
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Dismissal
Judge: Hirsch, Anne |
|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Continuance Clerks Dismissal - Noted |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Mail Returned Unclaimed | |
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice 14: NOTICE STRIKING SCHEDULING DATE; |
|
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judge Erik D. Price, Trial Scheduling Conference SCHEDULING CONFERENCE |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 13: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.