Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lewis, Douglas Jack, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case against State Of Washington, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2013 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Courts Request 7: HEARING CANCELLED: COURT'S REQUEST; MURPHY CC NASTANSKY; |
|
December 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Civil Miscellaneous Calendar 9:00 AM RESTORE FIREARM RIGHTS |
|
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Restoring Firearms Rights 6: ORDER RESTORING FIREARMS RIGHTS; |
|
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Response 5: RESPONSE STATE; |
|
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 4: NOTICE OF HEARING; 12-13-2013CM; RESTORE FIREARM RIGHTS; |
|
December 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Petition 3: PETITION; |
|
December 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Received 2: FILING FEE RECEIVED; |
|
December 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Information Cover Sheet 1: CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET; |
|
December 04, 2013 | Docket Event | ADM01 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.