Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Corby, Nicole R, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Carr, Harold D., in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Carol Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarol Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2013 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 12: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; |
|
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judge Carol Murphy, Trial Scheduling Conference SCHEDULING CONFERENCE |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Statement of Arbitrability -: STATEMENT OF ARBITRABILITY; MURPHY CC SHACKLEY CR SHACKELL; |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judge Carol Murphy, Civil Motion Calendar ARBITRATION |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason 11: HEARING STRICKEN: IN COURT OTHER; |
|
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 10: NOTICE OF HEARING; 02-21-2014M1; ARBITRATION; |
|
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense 9: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE; |
|
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment 8: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT MURPHY; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.