Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Fiala, Suzanne J Md, filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case against Medical Quality Assurance Commission, State Department Of Health, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Chris Wickham presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2012 |
CategoryAlr Administrative Law Review |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 3: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT; 03-29-2013; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; |
|
March 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
NonJury Trial 27: NON-JURY TRIAL; ACTUAL PROCEEDING TIME; JUDGE CHRIS WICKHAM; CC PITTMAN CR BESWICK; |
|
March 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal 28: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; |
|
March 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Court Decision to Affirm Appeal Review | |
March 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judge H. Christopher Wickham, Non-Jury Trials MOTION TO VOID EXAM |
|
March 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judge H. Christopher Wickham, Non-Jury Trials TRIAL 9:00 |
|
March 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Reply 26: REPLY PETITIONER; |
|
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Response 24: RESPONSE; |
|
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 25: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Issue 23: NOTICE OF ISSUE; 03-28-2013N8; MOTION TO VOID EXAM; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.