Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Midland Fundingllc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Suttell & Hammer P.S., against Caudill, Darren, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Christine Schaller presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2012 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) -: NOTE FOR CALENDAR COURT ADMIN; 09-13-2013; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; |
|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice 15: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE; |
|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss 14: MOTION TO DISMISS; |
|
June 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judge Christine Schaller, Trial Scheduling Conference SCHEDULING CONFERENCE-1 |
|
June 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Note for Calendar Court Administrator -: NOTE FOR CALENDAR COURT ADMIN; 09-13-2013; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; |
|
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested 13: CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; SCHALLER CC NASTANSKY; |
|
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Note for Calendar Court Administrator -: NOTE FOR CALENDAR COURT ADMIN; 06-14-2013C2; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE-1; |
|
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judge Christine Schaller, Trial Scheduling Conference SCHEDULING CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.