Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Zoning - Property case in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Christine Schaller presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2012 |
CategoryLupa Land Use Petition Act |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeZoning |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Receipts 63: RECEIPT RECORD RETURNED TO AGENCY; |
|
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Remand 62: ORDER OF REMAND; |
|
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 61: MOTION HEARING; JUDGE CHRISTINE SCHALLER; CC CHARPENTIER CR SHACKELL; |
|
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judge Christine Schaller, Civil Motion Calendar PRESENT ORDER |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
NonJury Trial 60: NON-JURY TRIAL; 05-03-2013M2; PRESENT ORDER; ACTUAL PROCEEDING TIME; JUDGE CHRISTINE SCHALLER; CC SHACKLEY CR SHACKELL; |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judge Christine Schaller, Civil Motion Calendar HEARING 11:00 |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Court Decision to Reverse Appeal Review | |
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability 59: NOTICE OF ABSENCE/UNAVAILABILITY; |
|
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 58: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 55: MOTION HEARING; JUDGE CHRISTINE SCHALLER; CC SHACKLEY CR SHACKELL; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.