Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Ortiz, Liriola L, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2012 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 20: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 19: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 18: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 16: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 17: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 15: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
May 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 14: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
May 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 13: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 12: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 3: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT; 03-22-2013; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.