Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Lash, William M, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2012 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Garnishment | |
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Garnishment | |
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Garnishment | |
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.