Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Vatne, Emtisal, filed a(n) Inj Injunction case represented by Morgan, John Michael, against Farag, Nabil, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Chris Wickham presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2012 |
CategoryInj Injunction |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mandate 44: MANDATE DISMISSING; |
|
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Decision of Appellate Court 43: DECISION FROM APPELLATE COURT; |
|
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed 42: TRANSMITTAL LETTER - COPY FILED; |
|
April 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal to Court of Appeals 41: NOTICE OF APPEAL TO COURT OF APPEAL; |
|
April 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Reconsideration 40: MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed 39: TRANSMITTAL LETTER - COPY FILED; |
|
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal to Court of Appeals 38: NOTICE OF APPEAL TO COURT OF APPEAL; |
|
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Hearing 36: SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING; JUDGE CHRIS WICKHAM; CC BALDERSTON CR BESWICK; |
|
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment 37: JUDGMENT & PERMANENT INJUNCTION; |
|
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judge H. Christopher Wickham, Civil Motion Calendar SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.