Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Tran, Rochelle, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Flores, Joel Michael, against Turner, Jene, Turner, Maria, Turner, Raymond Jr W H, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Erik D. Price presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2012 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 20: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; |
|
September 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
September 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Settlement and Removal from Arbitration Calendar 19: ARB STTLMNT & REMOVAL FROM ARB CAL; |
|
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 18: NOTICE OF HEARING NO DATE NOTED; |
|
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judge Erik D. Price, Trial Scheduling Conference SCHEDULING CONFERENCE |
|
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Note for Calendar Court Administrator -: NOTE FOR CALENDAR COURT ADMIN; 03-29-2013C4; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; |
|
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judge Erik D. Price, Trial Scheduling Conference SCHEDULING CONFERENCE |
|
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense 17: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE; |
|
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Acceptance of Service 16: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.