Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Filer, Nicholas R, against Boback, Leigha, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Christine Schaller presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2012 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Release of Judgment Lien | |
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 3: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT; 03-15-2013; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; |
|
February 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 20: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment 19: JUDGMENT; |
|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order on Show Cause 17: ORDER ON SHOW CAUSE; |
|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of NonMilitary Service 18: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; |
|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 15: MOTION HEARING; JUDGE CHRISTINE SCHALLER; CC CHARPENTIER CR SHACKELL; |
|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 16: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Proceedings Calendar 9:00 AM SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDING |
|
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 14: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.