Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kelly, Nicole, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Potvin, Kathryn N, against Diggins, Jane Doe H W, Diggins, Michael G, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Christine Schaller presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 37: ORDER SETTING CASE SCHEDULE; 08-02-2010; PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; |
|
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 61: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; |
|
July 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 59: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET; 07-02-2010; PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; |
|
July 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) -: NOTE FOR CALENDAR; 07-02-2010; PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; |
|
June 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement and Auth for Clerk to Strike Trial Date 60: NT STLMT/AUTH CLRK STRK TRIAL DATE; |
|
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment 56: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; |
|
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Memorandum 57: MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT; |
|
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment 58: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT CASEY; |
|
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket 59: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET; 07-02-2010; PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.