Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chase Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Henriques, Janalie Ann, against Vega, Jose M, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Francisca P. Tisher presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 03, 2010 |
CategoryOther Contract Limited (37) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time306 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Court Trial: Short Cause 251110-Court Trial: Short Cause; Chase Bank USA, N.A. vs. Vega, J. ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Mar 29 2011 Type: 243410 - Dismissal: Other Court Ordered Manner : 241110 - Before Trial |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice 212910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff NOTICE [212910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 241110-Conference: Case Management; Chase Bank USA, N.A. vs. Vega, J. ; Judge: J21160 Tisher Francisca P. Judge: Tisher, Francisca P. |
|
December 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference 231110-Statement: Case Man Conference Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff STATEMENT: CASE MAN CONFERENCE [231110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Order-Grant 211140-Fee Waiver Order-Grant Filed/Issued By: 911120 - Defendant Pro Per FEE WAIVER ORDER-GRANT [211140] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By DEFENDANT PRO PER [911120] |
|
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 212310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 911120 - Defendant Pro Per PROOF OF SERVICE [212310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By DEFENDANT PRO PER [911120] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.