Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Abrams, Dustin G., Perry, Michael S., filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case represented by Wall, Richard David, against City Of Chewelah, Washington, represented by Connelly, Michael F., in the jurisdiction of Stevens County, WA, . Stevens County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2020 |
CategoryPra Public Records Act |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationStevens County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Monasmith, Patrick A |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Radzimski, Lech |
|
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Presentation of Order Order of Dismissal without Oral Argument Judge: Radzimski, Lech |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment @11AM Judge: Monasmith, Patrick A |
|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Presentation Order of Dismissal 9-4-20 @ 9 AM |
|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Summary Judgment Against Dustin Abrams |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.