Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Barclays Bank Delaware, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Filer, Nicholas R, Jindra, Robert, against Fram, Jane Doe H W, Fram, Ronnie L, in the jurisdiction of Stevens County, WA, . Stevens County, WA Superior Courts with Patrick A. Monasmith presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2013 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationStevens County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Substitution of Counsel Robert C. Jindra for Plaintiff |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 21: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 20: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK , NFN; |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 19: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; JUDGE PATRICK MONASMITH, DEPT 1; |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant 18: JDGMT ON ANSWER OF GARN DEF; |
|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Application 17: APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT ON ANSWER; |
|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of NonMilitary Service 16: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; |
|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 15: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 14: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.