Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cbs Collections Inc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Williams, Brad Lyle, against Newman, Benjamin, Newman, Karri L, in the jurisdiction of Stevens County, WA, . Stevens County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2007 |
CategoryTrj Transcript Of Judgment |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStevens County, WA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Copy -: COPY CASE; |
|
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 5: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 2ND; |
|
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 4: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 3: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: ADDUS HEALTHCARE INC , NFN; |
|
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 2: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
December 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Transcript of Judgment 1: TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT; |
|
December 24, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Transfer of Judgment | |
December 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Received -: FILING FEE RECEIVED; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.