Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Coogan Gehr, Anne K, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Julia M. Pelc presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulia M. Pelc Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2023 |
CategoryEst Estate |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2023 | Affidavit of Publication | ||
April 10, 2023 | Notice of Appointment and Pendency of Probate | ||
April 10, 2023 |
Affidavit of Mailing Notice TO WDSHS |
||
April 10, 2023 | Notice to Creditors | ||
April 05, 2023 | Letters Testamentary | ||
March 20, 2023 | Case Resolution Personal Representative Guardian Appointed | ||
March 20, 2023 |
Ex Parte Action With Order ORDER ADMITTING COPY OF WILL TO PROBATE, CONFIRMING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE WITH NONINTERVENTION POWERS |
||
March 20, 2023 |
Order Admitting Will Appt Personal Representative Adj Solv
Judge: Pelc, Julia |
||
March 20, 2023 |
Last Will and Testament WITH COPY |
||
March 15, 2023 | Codicil |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.