Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Webb, Ronald L, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dyer, Erin Colleen, against C & C Yard Care Inc, Gibbs, Ryan L, represented by Smith, Brad E, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Timothy B. Fennessy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Fennessy, Timothy B |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Fennessy, Timothy B |
|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit ERIN C. DYER |
|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR ORDER FOR CONTEMPT OF COURT & SANCTION FOR WITNESS TALYR MOBLEY |
|
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause 7/15/22 @ 4:00 PM / 307 Judge: Fennessy, Timothy B |
|
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order Court signs: Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt for 7/15/2022 @4:00/CR #307. Presented by Erin Dyer Judge: Fennessy, Timothy B |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Minutes
Judge: Fennessy, Timothy B |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Petition TO EXCLUDE WITNESS TALYR MOBLEY Judge: Fennessy, Timothy B |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing REPORTER: T BLOCKER ATP: E DYER ATD: B SMITH SIGNED: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO EXCLUDE WITNESS TAYLR MOBLEY Judge: Fennessy, Timothy B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.