Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Pau Taylor, Shanna, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Herman, Lloyd Allen, against Farmers Elevator Of Kensington Mn Inc, Kaluza, Scott A, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2021 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Transmittal Letter Copy Filed | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Change of Venue | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Petition for Removal to US District Court | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment JUDGE SZAMBELAN |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.