Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Shine On Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Helmstadter, Andrew Lee, against Flippin Auto And Rv Sales Llc, Western Surety Company, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Charnelle M. Bjelkengren presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharnelle M. Bjelkengren Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution ON PERSONAL PROPERTY COPY |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Praecipe for Execution on Personal Property | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Litigant
Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING WESTERN SURETY PRESENTED BY: HELMSTADTER Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Amending Case Schedule 11/05/21 @ 8:30 AM Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: ORDER RESCHEDULING CSC DATE 11/5/2021 @ 8:30 AM Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit JIM HANSEN |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Default
Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.