Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Riepe, Rachelle A, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Gingras, Scott Atkinson, against Affordable Care Llc, Affordable Dentures Dental Laboratories Llc, Michael W Sant Dmd Pc, Sant, Michael W, Sant, Rayleen, (total of 5) See All represented by Krupicka, Bradley, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Annette S. Plese presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnnette S. Plese Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 2021 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request CD/TAPE |
|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: ORDER ON MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME, MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL PLEADINGS, AND CROSS MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT Judge: Plese, Annette S |
|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Shortening Time MOTION TO STRIKE, PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL PLEADINGS, & CROSS MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT Judge: Plese, Annette S |
|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: AMENDED CIVIL CASE SCHEDULE ORDER PT-9/15/23 AT 10AM T-9/25/23 AT 9AM Judge: Plese, Annette S |
|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Plese, Annette S |
|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Trial Minutes | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Amending Case Schedule
Judge: Plese, Annette S |
|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reply SUPPORT STRIKE MT |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Objection Opposition TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE SUPPLEMENTAL PLEADINGS |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit SCOTT A. GINGRAS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.