Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Washington, State Of, filed a(n) Msc3 Miscellaneous - Domestic case against Basso, Derek A, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Kevin D. Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin D. Stewart Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 22, 2020 |
CategoryMsc3 Miscellaneous - Domestic |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order CLOSING CASE Judge: Stewart, Kevin |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Stricken In Court NonAppearance Signed: Order Closing Case Judge: Stewart, Kevin |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Modify Child Support | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Continuance 3/28/22 - DSHS Judge: Stewart, Kevin |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Continued Stipulated Signed: Order for Continuance 3/28/22 Judge: Stewart, Kevin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.