Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Stollings, Christine, Stollings, Michael, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Mortensen, Wesley D, against Western Surety Company, Wright, Rick J, represented by Harrison, Frank Stuart, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Maryann C. Moreno presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2020 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule 12/03/2021 @ 8:30 AM Judge: Moreno, Maryann C |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order Order Rescheduling Case Status Conference Date Judge: Moreno, Maryann C |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Correspondence FROM CLERK CASHIER DEPT |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Status Conference
Judge: Moreno, Maryann C |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order Order Rescheduling Case Status Conference Date Judge: Moreno, Maryann C |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Disburse Funds
Judge: Szambelan, Michelle D |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Authorizing TENDER & EXONERATION OF BOND Judge: Moreno, Maryann C |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order Stipulation and Order Authorizing Tender and Exoneration of Bond and Reservation of Rights of Surety Judge: Moreno, Maryann C |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Status Conference
Judge: Moreno, Maryann C |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order Order Rescheduling Case Status Conference Date Judge: Moreno, Maryann C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.