Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Deluge Llc, Deluge Rosin Llc, Wallace, Nicholas, filed a(n) Inj Injunction case represented by Norton, Whitny L., against Lamb, Tim, Mean The Green Llc, Stoltz, Frank "Joe", Stoner Street Productions Llc, represented by Johnson, Reid, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Annette S. Plese presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2020 |
CategoryInj Injunction |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Plese, Annette S |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Finality DISMISSED |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order FOR DISBURSEMENT Judge: Plese, Annette S |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order Court signs: Stipulation and Order for Disbursement of Funds from Court Registry. Presented by Whitny Norton Judge: Plese, Annette S |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Transmittal Letter Copy Filed | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Copy STATEMENT OF ARRANGEMENTS |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Designation of Clerks Papers | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendants List of Witnesses | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Perfection Notice from Court of Appeals |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.