Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Pacheco, Jason, Pacheco, Stacie M, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Swindler, Geoffrey D., against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, represented by Cronin, Steven M., in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Maryann C. Moreno presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2020 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Moreno, Maryann C |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order Stipulation and Order for Dismissal Judge: Moreno, Maryann C |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule 6-6-2022 9AM TRIAL Judge: Moreno, Maryann C |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order CIVIL CASE SCHEDULE ORDER Judge: Moreno, Maryann C |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment JUDGE MORENO |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.