Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jacobs, Colleen, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Maurer, Joshua, against Spikes Restaurant Group, represented by Doll, Kent Neil, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Price, Michael P |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order Signed: Stipulation and order of dismissal with predjudice - Doll Judge: Price, Michael P |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss STIP |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Witness List SUPPLEMENTAL PLA REBUTTAL WITNESSES |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Witness List PLTFS AMENDED RBTTL |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Amending Case Schedule
Judge: Price, Michael P |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Continuance
Judge: Price, Michael P |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order Signed: Amended civil CSO PT: 5/7 TD: 5/17; Stipulated motion and agreed order to continue trial - Dept. 5 Judge: Price, Michael P |
|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Witness List PLTFS AMENDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.