Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Curtis, Jeannette, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Maurer, Joshua, against Gonazalez, Carlos, Gonzalez, Adrian, Atilanos 2015 Llc, represented by Eberhard, Jeffrey Dean, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2020 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order Signed: Stipulation and order of dismissal - Maurer Judge: Price, Michael P |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Price, Michael P |
|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address OF ATTORNEY |
|
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Witness List PLAINTIFFS |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule
Judge: Hazel, Tony D |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order Signed: Civil Case Schedule Order Judge: Hazel, Tony D |
|
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.