Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Clare, Kevin P, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Best, Ryan M., against Claire, Andrea J, Telquist, George E, Telquist Mcmillen Clare Pllc, represented by Telquist, George E., in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Raymond F. Clary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaymond F. Clary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 02, 2019 |
CategoryMal Other Malpractice |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mandate AFFIRMED |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Transmittal Letter Copy Filed | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerks Papers Sent 1st Supplemental Pages 1027-1101 to Court of Appeals |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Index TO CLERKS PAPERS 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Designation of Clerks Papers SUPPLEMENTAL |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Transmittal Letter Copy Filed | |
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Index TO CLERKS PAPERS |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Designation of Clerks Papers | |
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Perfection Notice from Court of Appeals | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Transmittal Letter Copy Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.