Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tschauder, Deborah T, Tschauder, Richard J W H, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Love, Kathleen A H W, represented by Bendele, Levi Lewis, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with John O. Cooney presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn O. Cooney Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2019 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Trial SMAN : Judge Calendars |
|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event | TS Trial Setting | |
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference SMAN : Judge Calendars |
|
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Cooney, John O |
|
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order Stipulatoin and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice - L. Bendele Judge: Cooney, John O |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Setting for PreTrial Hearing 4-12-19@9/COONEY |
|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | TS Trial Setting | |
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event | TS Trial Setting | |
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Amending Case Schedule 31: ORDER AMENDING CASE SCHEDULE; 04-22-2019TS; JUDGE JOHN O. COONEY - ID# 33; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.