Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Ll, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mercado, Christopher Jason, against Kassim, Raghda, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Michelle L. Ressa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichelle L. Ressa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 18, 2017 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Release of Judgment Lien | |
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 35: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 34: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT 18905569-5; |
|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 33: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 17905085-7; |
|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 32: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant 31: JDGMT ON ANSWER OF GARN DEF; 17905085-7 18905569-5; COMMISSIONER RACHELLE E ANDERSON; |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 30: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of NonMilitary Service 28: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.