Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Smythe, Nicholas, filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case represented by Best, Ryan M., against Employment Security Dept, represented by Kardong, Catherine, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Maryann C. Moreno presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaryann C. Moreno Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2018 |
CategoryAlr Administrative Law Review |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Destruction ORDER DESTROY CRABR Judge: Clarke, Harold D, III |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice 38: NOTICE UNAVAILABILITY; |
|
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order 37: ORDER ON RECONSIDERATION; JUDGE MARYANN C. MORENO; |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings 36: PROPOSED ORDER/FINDINGS; |
|
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response 35: RESPONSE TO RECONSIDER MT; |
|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter 34: LETTER RE: 04-20-2018 DATE; |
|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings 32: PROPOSED ORDER/FINDINGS; |
|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket 33: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET; 05-25-2018 @ 10 AM; |
|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion 31: MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order 30: ORDER GRANT PLA JUDICIAL REVIEW; JUDGE MARYANN C. MORENO; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.