Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Swanson, Roslyn, Swanson, Sherrie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Hilby, Leslie E, represented by Smythe, Andrew Campbell, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Annette S. Plese presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2016 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | TS Trial Setting | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 10: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; JUDGE ANNETTE S. PLESE - ID#24; |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Witness List 9: WITNESS LIST PLTFS; |
|
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address 8: NOTICE OF ADDRESS CHANGE; |
|
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule 7: ORDER SETTING CASE SCHEDULE; 07-16-2018TS; JUDGE JAMES M. TRIPLET; |
|
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 6: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter 5: LETTER RE: 05-26-2017 DATE; |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 4: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; 12-27-16 LESLIE HILBY; |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 3: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; 12-27-16 JANE DOE HILBY; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.