Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Discount Lumber & Building Supplies Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Church, Michael H., against American Contractors Indeminity Company, Emerald Stone Homes, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2013 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Copy 21: COPY OF ORDER QUASHING WARRANT; |
|
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Quashing Bench Warrant 19: ORDER QUASHING BENCH WARRANT7-24-14; PRO TEM COM NIKKI SWENNUMSON; |
|
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 20: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT 149010109; |
|
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion 18: MOTION QUASH WARRANT; |
|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order 17: ORDER FOR CONTEMPT; PRO TEM COM JOSEPH LINEHAN; |
|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 15: DECLARATION NON SERVICE; |
|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit for Bench Warrant 16: MOTION & AFFIDAVIT BENCH WARRANT; |
|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit 14: AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTEMPT; |
|
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 13: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; 07-08-2014; |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit for Examination of Judgment Debtor 10: MOTION&AFDT EXAM OF JDGMNT DEBTOR; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.