Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Garcia, Deandrea M Etvir, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with High Edward presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHigh Edward Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 02, 2013 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Release OF WRIT |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit FOR GARNISHMENT FOR CONTINUING LIEN ON EARNINGS |
|
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Release of Judgment Lien | |
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant
Judge: High Edward, Jacquelyn |
|
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 2ND |
|
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit in Support | |
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion JDGMT |
|
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.