Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
All Star Property Management, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Mcgarry, Thomas Reed, against Hitchcock, Travis, Hvolboll, Edward Etal, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Tari S. Eitzen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2012 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Destruction -: ORDER OF DESTRUCTION; |
|
April 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice 15: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE; JUDGE SALVATORE F. COZZA; |
|
April 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Uncontested Resolution Hearing -: UNCONTESTED RESOLUTION HEARING; JUDGE SALVATORE F. COZZA; |
|
April 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing Stricken In Court NonAppearance -: HEARING STRICKEN:IN COURT NONAPPEAR; |
|
April 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
March 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Unclaimed 14: MAIL RETURN - UNCLAIMED; |
|
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause 13: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; 04-17-2013 @ 9:30 AM; JUDGE SALVATORE F. COZZA; |
|
February 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Return of Service 12: RETURN OF SERVICE 02-13-2013; |
|
February 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing Continued Stipulated -: HEARING CONTINUED: STIPULATED; JUDGE SALVATORE F. COZZA; |
|
February 21, 2013 | Docket Event | TF Short Hearings |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.