Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Northcon Inc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Yahne, Ryan D, against Cincinnati Insurance Company, Gropp Electric Inc, Gropp, Tad Etux, Mercury Electric Corporation, Ratsch, Jane Doe, (total of 7) See All represented by Hailey, Robert Powers, Utz, Diane Carol, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Tony D. Hazel presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2012 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Destruction -: ORDER OF DESTRUCTION; |
|
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 32: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; JUDGE TONY HAZEL; |
|
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
August 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice 31: NOTICE OF RESOLUTION; |
|
April 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Litigant 30: ORDER DISMISSING LITIGANT; JUDGE TARI S. EITZEN; |
|
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss 28: MOTION TO DISMISS; |
|
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 29: NOTICE OF HEARING; 05-03-2013 @ 2:30 PM; |
|
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Memorandum 27: MEMORANDUM SUPPORT DISMISSAL MOTION; |
|
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer 26: ANSWER; |
|
April 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Stay Regarding Bankruptcy 25: NOTICE OF STAY RE: BANKRUPTCY; AMENDED X-X; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.